skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 1:24:44 PM

Bhushan, Chhabi

CPSO#: 20517

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 15 Dec 1986
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Lucknow, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1959
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jul 1960
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1961
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jul 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1962
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1963
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1966
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Oct 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1974
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Dec 1986