skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/08/2019 4:37:11 PM

Urtasun, Raul Camilo

CPSO#: 20513

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 21 Jul 1998
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 1998