skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/07/2019 12:07:30 AM

Johnston, James Gregory

CPSO#: 19961

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 27 Feb 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 27 Feb 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 387 Cedar St Simcoe ON N3Y 2J2 Tel: 519.426.7583
Date Received: 01 Feb 2019

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Feb 2019