skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/07/2019 4:37:21 PM

Ford, Stuart Edward

CPSO#: 19772

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1972 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018