skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/09/2019 9:55:18 PM

Reid-Smith, Edward Anthony Michael

CPSO#: 19763

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 12 Sep 1989
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Dublin, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1966
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 12 Sep 1989