skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/09/2019 9:27:10 PM

Porter, Michael John

CPSO#: 19652

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 16 Nov 1984
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1965
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Oct 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1980
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 16 Nov 1984