skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/06/2019 10:19:24 PM

Curtis, John Edgar

CPSO#: 19636

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Apr 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 2014