skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/09/2019 3:05:40 PM

Conners, John Stewart

CPSO#: 19631

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 185 Inkerman Street East Listowel ON N4W 2N1
Date Received: 23 Apr 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2015