skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 6:41:58 AM

Damiani, Vicki Mary

CPSO#: 19503

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jun 2000
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Oct 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Oct 1997