skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 11:15:19 PM

Strachan, Peter George

CPSO#: 19492

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Peter G. Strachan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 18 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management 200 - 488 Carlingview Dr Toronto, ON M9W 6M8 and Records Management Ltd 13 - 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Phone: 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 19 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018