skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/06/2019 10:07:06 AM

Polak, Danuta

CPSO#: 19419

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Aug 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Dublin, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1965
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002