skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/08/2019 12:11:55 PM

McCulloch, John Alexander

CPSO#: 19298

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Feb 1991
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Feb 1991

Summary

Date of Death: 14-Mar-2002

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Feb 1991