skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/09/2019 6:45:29 PM

Blake-Knox, Peter Ernest Anthony

CPSO#: 19280

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 May 1990
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 28-Apr-2013

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Dublin, 1950

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1953
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Apr 1954
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 May 1990