skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 6:11:16 PM

Gulens, Voldemars

CPSO#: 19198

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Latvian

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. V. Gulens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 14 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 2019