skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 7:40:24 AM

Henderson, Donald Robert

CPSO#: 19170

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jun 1964
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1964

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Medical Centre Diagnost
210-63 N. Algoma St.
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4Z6
Phone: (807) 683-4411
Fax: (807) 345-7090 Electoral District: 09

Additional Practice Location(s)

407-1265 Arthur St. E.
Thunder Bay Ultrasound
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 6E7
Canada
Phone: 807-622-2244
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D.R. Henderson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Henderson ( CPSO# 19170 )

Business Address:
210 - 63 North Algoma Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4Z6
Phone Number: (807) 683-4411

Business Address:
Thunderbay Ultrasound
4th Floor
1265 Arthur St. East
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 6H7
Phone Number: (807) 622-2244

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 17 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DONALD ROBERT HENDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENDERSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1964