skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 6:08:27 PM

Lee, Randolph

CPSO#: 19157

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010