skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 10:24:14 AM

Cooper, Perry William

CPSO#: 19104

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jun 1964
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1964

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Hillhurst Blvd.
Toronto ON  M4R 1K4
Phone: (647) 349-8199
Fax: (647) 341-3507 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PERRY WILLIAM COOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOPER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Mar 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1970