skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/06/2019 10:37:30 PM

Baker, Robert Stanley

CPSO#: 19061

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Baker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: McLean Clinic 50 Burnhamthorpe Road West Mississauga, ON L5B 3C2
Date Received: 15 Jul 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jul 2015