skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/09/2019 9:49:30 PM

Van Leeuwen, Jacobus Johannes

CPSO#: 18952

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:State University of Leiden, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009