skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/08/2019 12:34:14 PM

Jaworski, Zdzislaw Feliks

CPSO#: 18712

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 12 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Polish

Education:University of Brussels, 1949

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1961 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 1996