skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/07/2019 4:37:06 AM

Morris, Frederick Richard

CPSO#: 18710

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 28 Oct 1992
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 May 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1963
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Oct 1992