skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/09/2019 2:33:08 PM

Noyek, Arnold Melvyn

CPSO#: 18620

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Oct 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Oct 2017

Summary

Date of Death: 14-Dec-2018

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1961
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Oct 2017