skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/07/2019 5:05:40 AM

Bull, Maurice Henry

CPSO#: 18578

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 13 Feb 2001
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Feb 2001
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:English Conjoint Board, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1963
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 13 Feb 2001

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 13 Feb 2001
Summary:

 On February 13, 2001, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Bull guilty of professional misconduct in 
 that he engaged in acts of sexual impropriety; in that he sexually abused a patient; and, that he 
 engaged in conduct unbecoming a physician.

The Committee ordered that Dr. Bull be reprimanded and 
 the reprimand be recorded on the register. As well, the Committee ordered his certificate of 
 registration be revoked.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 13, 2001