skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/09/2019 10:36:31 PM

Donsky, Gordon Joel

CPSO#: 18557

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Mar 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 211 1849 Yonge Street Toronto ON M4S 1Y2 And 18 Tofino Crescent Toronto ON M3B 1R8
Date Received: 24 Mar 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1961
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Mar 2016