skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 9:09:22 PM

Vedova, Joseph Dalla

CPSO#: 18533

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Date of Death: 30-Jan-2019

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Naples, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Joseph D. Vedova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 7 2012

Medical Records Location

Address: Safe Store 2704 Hwy 20 Fonthill, ON L0S 1E6 Tel: (905) 892-0010
Date Received: 09 May 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 1962 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1959
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012