skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/07/2019 7:35:53 PM

Basrur, Vasanth Rao

CPSO#: 18530

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Feb 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 12 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Kannada, Konkani

Education:University of Toronto, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Vasanth Basrur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 6 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 11 Mar 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Feb 2015