skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 6:50:18 AM

Evans, James Charles

CPSO#: 18510

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Date of Death: 23-Jul-2009

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2009