skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 10:48:52 PM

Weston, Roy Bertrand

CPSO#: 18368

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 20 Oct 1995
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 23-Apr-2004

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Dec 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 May 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Oct 1995