skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/08/2019 11:38:40 AM

Bacon, Thomas Nicholas

CPSO#: 18326

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 15 Jun 2000
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Jun 2000
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1962
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 15 Jun 2000

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 May 2000
Summary:

 On May 26, 2000, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Bacon guilty of professional misconduct for 
 failing to maintain the standards of the profession and incompetence. Subsequently, the committee 
 ordered that the Registrar is directed to revoke the certificate of registration effective June 
 15, 2000.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 24, 2000