skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/08/2019 11:38:32 AM

Donisch, Valentine

CPSO#: 18155

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Nov 1992
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German, Latvian, Russian

Education:Rhenish Frederick William Univ of Bonn, 1948

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1961
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Nov 1992