skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 7:37:43 AM

Guest, Joan Eileen

CPSO#: 18145

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Dec 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 1961
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 18 Nov 2014
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 05 Jan 2015
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Dec 2015