skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 6:44:33 AM

Diosy, Andrew

CPSO#: 18072

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Aug 1995
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 6-Aug-2012

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of Szeged, 1950

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Aug 1995