skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 1:25:50 PM

Kertesz, Andrew

CPSO#: 18020

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jul 1961
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1961

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:Queen's University, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
39 Doncaster Ave
London ON  N6G 2A1
Phone: (519) 471-6088 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A. Kertesz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2015
Corporation Name: A. Kertesz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kertesz ( CPSO# 18020 )

Business Address:
39 Doncaster Avenue
London ON  N6G 2A1
Phone Number: (519) 471-6088

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1965 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 01 Jan 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW KERTESZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KERTESZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1961