skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/06/2019 9:54:10 AM

Titcombe, Archibald Frederick

CPSO#: 18011

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Oct 1994
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 22-Mar-2017

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Apr 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Oct 1994