skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 4:58:36 PM

Grosfield, Irving N

CPSO#: 17657

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 15 Mar 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1960
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 19 Jan 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jun 2019