skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/09/2019 10:40:47 PM

Beckett, Roy Frank

CPSO#: 17421

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Mar 2001
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Mar 2001

Summary

Date of Death: 11-Aug-2016

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Liverpool, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 13 Nov 1961 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Mar 2001