skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/07/2019 11:51:59 PM

Lau, Yat Poh

CPSO#: 17284

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 1373 Hazelton Blvd Burlington, ON L7P 4V2
Date Received: 27 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1959
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 May 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Apr 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018