skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/06/2019 9:00:39 AM

Pond, John Charles

CPSO#: 17245

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 May 1996

Summary

Date of Death: 27-Dec-2004

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1959 RCPSC Specialist
General Pathology Effective: 01 Jan 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1959
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1996