skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/06/2019 5:41:14 PM

Weber, Robert Kirkland

CPSO#: 17157

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jun 2001
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Jun 2001

Summary

Date of Death: 7-Nov-2006

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1959
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 2001