skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/07/2019 6:58:29 PM

Robinson, Louis

CPSO#: 17026

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2002

Summary

Date of Death: 29-Nov-2005

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Scottish Conjoint Board(Scottish triple), 1950

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1959 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1959
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2002