skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/06/2019 1:15:14 PM

Rouse, Frank Victor

CPSO#: 17021

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Frank Rouse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2013

Medical Records Location

Address: Lake Shore Medical Group Suite 502 345 Lakeshore Road East Oakville, ON L6J 1J5
Date Received: 08 May 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 1959
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014