skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 6:55:10 AM

Daicar, Anthony Otto

CPSO#: 16974

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jun 1998
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Jun 1998

Summary

Date of Death: 15-Apr-2016

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:Queen's University, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 1959
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 1998