skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 7:08:30 AM

Hildebrand, Alvin Fisher

CPSO#: 16711

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 19-Jan-2004

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 1949

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1962 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1958
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Aug 1984