skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 9:36:43 AM

Corbett, William Edward Nelson

CPSO#: 16664

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 12 Apr 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 12 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 01 Jan 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 1958
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Apr 2002