skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/08/2019 11:40:57 AM

Weisbrod, Wilfred Bernard

CPSO#: 16618

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1947

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 12 Nov 1958 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 1958
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jan 1961
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007