skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/09/2019 10:39:20 PM

Frei, Jaroslav Vaclav

CPSO#: 16595

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 May 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 1958
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1996