skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 11:48:17 PM

Kapsos, Joseph Ernest

CPSO#: 16429

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Mar 1990
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 1-Jan-2012

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1962 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1957
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Mar 1990