skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/07/2019 4:36:11 PM

Ralley, Len

CPSO#: 16177

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Aug 2013

Summary

Date of Death: 20-Nov-2018

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Nov 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1957
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2013