skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/07/2019 6:58:54 PM

Hodjera, Branislava

CPSO#: 15952

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2001
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2001

Summary

Date of Death: 9-Apr-2014

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, French, German, Serbian

Education:University of Belgrade, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1958 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1956
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001