skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/09/2019 10:36:01 PM

Swaine, Frederick Mccoy

CPSO#: 15933

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jul 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Jul 1996

Summary

Date of Death: 11-Jul-2013

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1949

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 01 Jan 1954 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1956
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jul 1996